|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-62
|
|
|
|
04/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1600
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Original reference removed: Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|