|
04/28/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-83
|
|
|
|
04/27/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/27/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1338
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|