Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 7, 2022