House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 7026
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted SB 7026
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Original reference removed: Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2022
|
Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|