CS/CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-02-c2 Page 1 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S A bill to be entitled 1 An act relating to a review under the Open Government 2 Sunset Review Act; amending s. 110.12301, F.S.; 3 designating the Department of Management Services, 4 rather than the Division of State Group Insurance, as 5 the entity required to contract for certain services 6 for the state group insurance program; authorizing the 7 department or contractor to require certain 8 information from subscribers; revising the type of 9 information the department or contractor may require 10 from subscribers for verifying dependent eligibility; 11 removing obsolete language; revising the retention 12 requirements for certain documentation; providing an 13 effective date. 14 15 Be It Enacted by the Legislatu re of the State of Florida: 16 17 Section 1. Subsection (2) of section 110.12301, Florida 18 Statutes, is amended to read: 19 110.12301 Competitive procurement of postpayment claims 20 review services and dependent eligibility verification services; 21 public records exemption.— 22 (2) The department Division of State Group Insurance is 23 directed to competitively procure a contract for dependent 24 eligibility verification services for the state group insurance 25 CS/CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-02-c2 Page 2 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S program; however, compensation under the contract may not exce ed 26 historical claim costs for the prior 12 months for the dependent 27 populations disenrolled as a result of the contractor's 28 services. 29 (a)1. By September 1, 2017, the division shall notify all 30 subscribers regarding the eligibility rules for dependents. 31 Through November 30, 2017, the division must hold subscribers 32 harmless for past claims of ineligible dependents if such 33 dependents are removed from plan membership before December 1, 34 2017. 35 2. Subparagraph 1. does not apply to any dependent 36 identified as ineligible before July 1, 2017, for which the 37 department has notified the state agency employing the 38 associated subscriber. 39 (a)(b) The department or the contractor providing 40 dependent eligibility verification services may require request 41 the following information from subscribers: 42 1. To prove a spouse's eligibility: 43 a. If married fewer less than 12 months and the subscriber 44 and his or her spouse have not filed a joint federal income tax 45 return, a copy of a government-issued marriage certificate; or 46 b. If married for 12 or more months, a copy of the 47 transcript of the most recently filed federal income tax return ; 48 or 49 c. If the documentation specified in sub -subparagraph a. 50 CS/CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-02-c2 Page 3 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S or sub-subparagraph b. cannot be produced, an attestation of the 51 marriage by sworn affidavit consistent with s. 92.50 . 52 2. To prove a biological child's or a newborn grandchild's 53 eligibility:, 54 a. A copy of a government-issued birth certificate ; or 55 b. If a government-issued birth certificate cannot be 56 produced, an attestation of the subscriber-dependent 57 relationship by sworn affidavit consistent with s. 92.50 . 58 3. To prove an adopted child's eligibility: 59 a. A copy of an adoption certificate; or 60 b. A copy of an adoption placement agreement and a 61 petition for adoption ; or 62 c. If the documentation specified in sub -subparagraph a. 63 or sub-subparagraph b. cannot be produced, an attestation of the 64 subscriber-dependent relationship by sworn affidavit consistent 65 with s. 92.50. 66 4. To prove a stepchild's eligibility , both of the 67 following: 68 a. A copy of a government-issued birth certificate for the 69 stepchild.; and 70 b. A copy of the transcript of the subscriber's most 71 recently filed federal income tax return. 72 5. To prove a child's eligibility under guardianship, a 73 copy of the court order naming the subscriber or the 74 subscriber's spouse as the child's legal guardian or custodian 75 CS/CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-02-c2 Page 4 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S Any other information necessary to verify the dependent's 76 eligibility for enrollment in the state group insurance program . 77 6. To prove a foster child's elig ibility, a copy of the 78 records showing the subscriber or the subscriber's spouse as the 79 child's foster parent. 80 7. To prove eligibility of an unmarried child who is at 81 least 26 but not more than 30 years of age, all of the 82 following: 83 a. A copy of the ch ild's government-issued birth 84 certificate or adoption certificate naming the subscriber or the 85 subscriber's spouse as the child's parent, or a copy of the 86 court order naming the subscriber or the subscriber's spouse as 87 the child's legal guardian or custodi an. 88 b. A copy of a completed Certification of Over -Age 89 Dependent Eligibility Form. 90 c. A document confirming the child's current enrollment as 91 a student, including the name of the child, the name of the 92 school where the child is enrolled, and the school term in which 93 the child is enrolled, or a bill or statement in the child's 94 name that is dated within the last 60 days and is mailed to the 95 child at an address in the state. 96 8. To prove eligibility of a disabled child who is at 97 least 26 years of age or older, both of the following: 98 a. A copy of the child's government -issued birth 99 certificate or adoption certificate naming the subscriber or the 100 CS/CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-02-c2 Page 5 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S subscriber's spouse as the child's parent, or a copy of the 101 court order naming the subscriber or the subscribe r's spouse as 102 the child's legal guardian or custodian. 103 b. A copy of the subscriber's or the subscriber's spouse's 104 most recently filed federal income tax return listing the 105 child's name and the last four digits of the child's social 106 security number and id entifying the child as the subscriber's or 107 the subscriber's spouse's dependent for tax purposes. 108 (b)(c) If a document requested from a subscriber is not 109 confidential or exempt from public records requirements, the 110 division and the contractor shall disclo se to all subscribers 111 that such information submitted to verify the eligibility of 112 dependents may be subject to disclosure and inspection under 113 chapter 119. 114 (c)(d) A government-issued marriage license or marriage 115 certificate submitted for dependent eligi bility verification 116 must include the date of the marriage between the subscriber and 117 the spouse. 118 (d)(e) A government-issued birth certificate submitted for 119 dependent eligibility verification must list the parents' names. 120 (e)(f) Foreign-born subscribers unable to obtain the 121 necessary documentation within the specified time period of 122 producing verification documentation may provide a sworn execute 123 a signed affidavit consistent with s. 92.50 attesting to 124 eligibility requirements. 125 CS/CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-02-c2 Page 6 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S (f)(g) Documentation submitted to verify eligibility may 126 be an original or a photocopy of an original document. Before 127 submitting a document, the subscriber may redact any information 128 on a document which is not necessary to verify the eligibility 129 of the dependent. 130 (g)(h) All documentation obtained by the department or 131 contractor to conduct the dependent eligibility verification 132 services must be retained in accordance with the applicable 133 records retention schedule until June 30, 2019. The department 134 or the contractor is not requi red to retain such documentation 135 after June 30, 2019, and shall destroy such documentation as 136 soon as practicable after such date. 137 Section 2. This act shall take effect July 1, 2022. 138