Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1443 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022