CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-01-c1 Page 1 of 4 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S A bill to be entitled 1 An act relating to dependent eligibility verification 2 services; amending s. 110.12301, F.S.; requiring the 3 Department of Management Services, rather than the 4 Division of State Group Insurance, to directly provide 5 or contract for certain services; removing 6 requirements for such contract; removing obsolete 7 language; revising the retention requirements for 8 certain documentation; providing an effective date. 9 10 Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 11 12 Section 1. Subsection (2) of section 110.12301, Florida 13 Statutes, is amended to read: 14 110.12301 Competitive procurement of postpayment claims 15 review services; and dependent eligibility verific ation 16 services; public records exemption. — 17 (2) The department may directly provide or Division of 18 State Group Insurance is directed to competitively procure a 19 contract for dependent eligibility verification services for the 20 state group insurance program ; however, compensation under the 21 contract may not exceed historical claim costs for the prior 12 22 months for the dependent populations disenrolled as a result of 23 the contractor's services . 24 (a)1. By September 1, 2017, the division shall notify all 25 CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-01-c1 Page 2 of 4 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S subscribers regarding the eligibility rules for dependents. 26 Through November 30, 2017, the division must hold subscribers 27 harmless for past claims of ineligible dependents if such 28 dependents are removed from plan membership before December 1, 29 2017. 30 2. Subparagraph 1. does not apply to any dependent 31 identified as ineligible before July 1, 2017, for which the 32 department has notified the state agency employing the 33 associated subscriber. 34 (a)(b) The contractor providing dependent eligibility 35 verification services ma y request the following information from 36 Subscribers must provide all of the following information to the 37 department or the contractor providing dependent eligibility 38 verification services : 39 1. To prove a spouse's eligibility: 40 a. If married fewer less than 12 months and the subscriber 41 and his or her spouse have not filed a joint federal income tax 42 return, a government -issued marriage certificate; or 43 b. If married for 12 or more months, a transcript of the 44 most recently filed federal income tax return. 45 2. To prove a biological child's or a newborn grandchild's 46 eligibility, a government -issued birth certificate. 47 3. To prove an adopted child's eligibility: 48 a. An adoption certificate; or 49 b. An adoption placement agreement and a petition for 50 CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-01-c1 Page 3 of 4 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S adoption. 51 4. To prove a stepchild's eligibility: 52 a. A government-issued birth certificate for the 53 stepchild; and 54 b. The transcript of the subscriber's most recently filed 55 federal income tax return. 56 5. Any other information necessary to verify the 57 dependent's eligibility for enrollment in the state group 58 insurance program. 59 (b)(c) If a document requested from a subscriber is not 60 confidential or exempt from public records requirements, the 61 division and the contractor shall disclose to all subscribers 62 that such information submitted to verify the eligibility of 63 dependents may be subject to disclosure and inspection under 64 chapter 119. 65 (c)(d) A government-issued marriage license or marriage 66 certificate submitted for dependent eligibility verification 67 must include the date of the marriage between the subscriber and 68 the spouse. 69 (d)(e) A government-issued birth certificate submitted for 70 dependent eligibility verification must list the parents' names. 71 (e)(f) Foreign-born subscribers unable to obtain the 72 necessary documentation within the specified time period of 73 producing verification documentation may execute a signed 74 affidavit attesting to eligibility requirements. 75 CS/HB 1443 2022 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb1443-01-c1 Page 4 of 4 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S (f)(g) Documentation submitted to verify eligibility may 76 be an original or a photocopy of an original document. Before 77 submitting a document, the subscriber may redact any information 78 on a document which is not necessary to verify the eligibility 79 of the dependent. 80 (g)(h) All documentation obtained by the contractor to 81 conduct the dependen t eligibility verification services must be 82 retained in accordance with the applicable records retention 83 schedule until June 30, 2019. The department or the contractor 84 is not required to retain such documentation after June 30, 85 2019, and shall destroy such documentation as soon as 86 practicable after such date. 87 Section 2. This act shall take effect July 1, 2022. 88