House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Filed |