Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022