House | 03/14/2022 | Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | PCS added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2022 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Filed |