Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022