House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Favorable by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 11/10/2021 | Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/10/2021 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 11/10/2021 | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/10/2021 | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/29/2021 | Filed |