Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022