|
05/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Substituted for SB 82
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Amendment 577361 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|