13 | 13 | | An act for the relief of Kareem Hawari by the Osceola 2 |
---|
14 | 14 | | County School Board; providing an appropriation to Mr. 3 |
---|
15 | 15 | | Hawari to compensate him for injuries and damages 4 |
---|
16 | 16 | | sustained as a result of the negligence of employees 5 |
---|
17 | 17 | | of the Osceola County School Board; providing 6 |
---|
18 | 18 | | limitations on the total amounts paid for certain 7 |
---|
19 | 19 | | fees, costs, and expenses; providing an effective 8 |
---|
20 | 20 | | date. 9 |
---|
21 | 21 | | 10 |
---|
22 | 22 | | WHEREAS, on March 5, 2010, at approximately 6 p.m., 13-11 |
---|
23 | 23 | | year-old Kareem Hawari was participating in a wrestling match 12 |
---|
24 | 24 | | sponsored by Harmony Community School in the School District of 13 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Osceola County, and 14 |
---|
26 | 26 | | WHEREAS, the wrestling match was supervised by coaches 15 |
---|
27 | 27 | | employed by the Osceola County School Board, each of whom had a 16 |
---|
28 | 28 | | duty to adequately supervise student athletes participating in 17 |
---|
29 | 29 | | school-sponsored athletic events by receiving proper training, 18 |
---|
30 | 30 | | providing adequate instruction to student athletes, reasonably 19 |
---|
31 | 31 | | selecting or matching student athletes to other s in their same 20 |
---|
32 | 32 | | weight class for purposes of competition, and monitoring 21 |
---|
33 | 33 | | athletic training and events, and 22 |
---|
34 | 34 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari's coach did not receive any formal 23 |
---|
35 | 35 | | training and failed to provide Mr. Hawari with adequate 24 |
---|
36 | 36 | | instruction before the match, and 25 |
---|
44 | 44 | | Page 2 of 4 |
---|
45 | 45 | | F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari was matched with a student athlete who 26 |
---|
48 | 48 | | was larger, stronger, and more experienced and who finished the 27 |
---|
49 | 49 | | 2010 and 2011 seasons as a county champion wrestler, and 28 |
---|
50 | 50 | | WHEREAS, due to the negligent supervision of the coaches, 29 |
---|
51 | 51 | | Mr. Hawari hit his head on the ground during the match and 30 |
---|
52 | 52 | | suffered a brainstem hemorrhage that resulted in a traumatic 31 |
---|
53 | 53 | | brain injury that affects his motor coordination and ability to 32 |
---|
54 | 54 | | speak, and 33 |
---|
55 | 55 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari was hospitalized at Osceola Regional 34 |
---|
56 | 56 | | Medical Center in Kiss immee on March 5, 2010, and was then 35 |
---|
57 | 57 | | transported by helicopter to Arnold Palmer Hospital for Children 36 |
---|
58 | 58 | | in Orlando, where he was admitted from March 6 to May 4, 2010, 37 |
---|
59 | 59 | | and 38 |
---|
60 | 60 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari underwent surgery on March 8, 2010, to 39 |
---|
61 | 61 | | relieve pressure on his bra in and had an additional surgery on 40 |
---|
62 | 62 | | March 24, 2010, and 41 |
---|
63 | 63 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari was thereafter transferred to Brooks 42 |
---|
64 | 64 | | Rehabilitation in Jacksonville, where he was a patient from May 43 |
---|
65 | 65 | | 4 to June 30, 2010, and 44 |
---|
66 | 66 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari received physical therapy at Flor ida 45 |
---|
67 | 67 | | Hospital Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation in Altamonte Springs 46 |
---|
68 | 68 | | on an outpatient basis from July 12 to October 1, 2014, and 47 |
---|
69 | 69 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari seeks to recover damages for his 48 |
---|
70 | 70 | | injuries, which include a permanent injury to his body as a 49 |
---|
71 | 71 | | whole, past and future pain and suffering of both a physical and 50 |
---|
79 | 79 | | Page 3 of 4 |
---|
80 | 80 | | F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S |
---|
81 | 81 | | |
---|
82 | 82 | | mental nature, disability, physical impairment, disfigurement, 51 |
---|
83 | 83 | | mental anguish, inconvenience, expense of hospitalization, 52 |
---|
84 | 84 | | medical and nursing care and treatment, loss of ability to earn 53 |
---|
85 | 85 | | money, and loss of ability to lead and enjoy a normal life, and 54 |
---|
86 | 86 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari incurred medical expenses in the amount 55 |
---|
87 | 87 | | of $708,309.92 and is permanently and totally disabled and 56 |
---|
88 | 88 | | unable to engage in any employment, and 57 |
---|
89 | 89 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari lived a full and vigorous lif e before 58 |
---|
90 | 90 | | his injury on March 5, 2010, had a zest for life, and was active 59 |
---|
91 | 91 | | in recreational, social, and sporting activities, and 60 |
---|
92 | 92 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari requires continuous assistance with 61 |
---|
93 | 93 | | activities of daily living and ongoing treatment for his 62 |
---|
94 | 94 | | injuries, and 63 |
---|
95 | 95 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari filed a lawsuit against the Osceola 64 |
---|
96 | 96 | | County School Board in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial 65 |
---|
97 | 97 | | Circuit, in and for Osceola County, alleging that the coaches in 66 |
---|
98 | 98 | | their employ had negligently supervised the wrestling match, 67 |
---|
99 | 99 | | causing his injuries, and 68 |
---|
100 | 100 | | WHEREAS, after extensive discovery and pretrial 69 |
---|
101 | 101 | | preparation, the parties reached a settlement agreement in the 70 |
---|
102 | 102 | | amount of $3.6 million, of which $100,000 has been paid pursuant 71 |
---|
103 | 103 | | to the limits of liability in former s. 768.28, Florida Statute s 72 |
---|
104 | 104 | | (2010), and the remainder is conditioned upon the passage of a 73 |
---|
105 | 105 | | claim bill, NOW, THEREFORE, 74 |
---|
106 | 106 | | 75 |
---|
114 | 114 | | Page 4 of 4 |
---|
115 | 115 | | F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S |
---|
116 | 116 | | |
---|
117 | 117 | | Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 76 |
---|
118 | 118 | | 77 |
---|
119 | 119 | | Section 1. The facts stated in the preamble to this act 78 |
---|
120 | 120 | | are found and declared to be true. 79 |
---|
121 | 121 | | Section 2. The Osceola County School Board is authorized 80 |
---|
122 | 122 | | and directed to appropriate from funds of the school board not 81 |
---|
123 | 123 | | otherwise encumbered and to draw a warrant in the sum of $3.5 82 |
---|
124 | 124 | | million payable to Kareem Hawari as compensation for injuries 83 |
---|
125 | 125 | | and damages sustained. 84 |
---|
126 | 126 | | Section 3. The amount paid by the Osceola County School 85 |
---|
127 | 127 | | Board pursuant to former s. 768.28, Florida Statutes (2010), and 86 |
---|
128 | 128 | | the amount awarded under this act are intended to provide the 87 |
---|
129 | 129 | | sole compensation for all present and future claims arising out 88 |
---|
130 | 130 | | of the factual situation described in this act which resulted in 89 |
---|
131 | 131 | | injuries and damages to Kareem Hawari. Of the amount awarded 90 |
---|
132 | 132 | | under this act, the total amount paid for attorney fees and 91 |
---|
133 | 133 | | lobbying fees may not exceed $875,000 and the total amount paid 92 |
---|
134 | 134 | | for costs or other similar expenses may not exceed $9,961.51. 93 |
---|
135 | 135 | | Section 4. This act shall take effect upon becoming a law. 94 |
---|