Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6513 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/24/2022

                                     
 ENROLLED  
CS/HB 6513, Engrossed 1 	2022 Legislature 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6513-03-er 
Page 1 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
      1 
An act for the relief of Kareem Hawari by the Osceola 2 
County School Board; providing an appropriation to Mr. 3 
Hawari to compensate him for injuries and damages 4 
sustained as a result of the negligence of employees 5 
of the Osceola County School Board; providing 6 
limitations on the total amounts paid for certain 7 
fees, costs, and expenses; providing an effective 8 
date. 9 
 10 
 WHEREAS, on March 5, 2010, at approximately 6 p.m., 13-11 
year-old Kareem Hawari was participating in a wrestling match 12 
sponsored by Harmony Community School in the School District of 13 
Osceola County, and 14 
 WHEREAS, the wrestling match was supervised by coaches 15 
employed by the Osceola County School Board, each of whom had a 16 
duty to adequately supervise student athletes participating in 17 
school-sponsored athletic events by receiving proper training, 18 
providing adequate instruction to student athletes, reasonably 19 
selecting or matching student athletes to other s in their same 20 
weight class for purposes of competition, and monitoring 21 
athletic training and events, and 22 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari's coach did not receive any formal 23 
training and failed to provide Mr. Hawari with adequate 24 
instruction before the match, and 25           
 ENROLLED  
CS/HB 6513, Engrossed 1 	2022 Legislature 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6513-03-er 
Page 2 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari was matched with a student athlete who 26 
was larger, stronger, and more experienced and who finished the 27 
2010 and 2011 seasons as a county champion wrestler, and 28 
 WHEREAS, due to the negligent supervision of the coaches, 29 
Mr. Hawari hit his head on the ground during the match and 30 
suffered a brainstem hemorrhage that resulted in a traumatic 31 
brain injury that affects his motor coordination and ability to 32 
speak, and 33 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari was hospitalized at Osceola Regional 34 
Medical Center in Kiss immee on March 5, 2010, and was then 35 
transported by helicopter to Arnold Palmer Hospital for Children 36 
in Orlando, where he was admitted from March 6 to May 4, 2010, 37 
and 38 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari underwent surgery on March 8, 2010, to 39 
relieve pressure on his bra in and had an additional surgery on 40 
March 24, 2010, and 41 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari was thereafter transferred to Brooks 42 
Rehabilitation in Jacksonville, where he was a patient from May 43 
4 to June 30, 2010, and 44 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari received physical therapy at Flor ida 45 
Hospital Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation in Altamonte Springs 46 
on an outpatient basis from July 12 to October 1, 2014, and 47 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari seeks to recover damages for his 48 
injuries, which include a permanent injury to his body as a 49 
whole, past and future pain and suffering of both a physical and 50           
 ENROLLED  
CS/HB 6513, Engrossed 1 	2022 Legislature 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6513-03-er 
Page 3 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
mental nature, disability, physical impairment, disfigurement, 51 
mental anguish, inconvenience, expense of hospitalization, 52 
medical and nursing care and treatment, loss of ability to earn 53 
money, and loss of ability to lead and enjoy a normal life, and 54 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari incurred medical expenses in the amount 55 
of $708,309.92 and is permanently and totally disabled and 56 
unable to engage in any employment, and 57 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari lived a full and vigorous lif e before 58 
his injury on March 5, 2010, had a zest for life, and was active 59 
in recreational, social, and sporting activities, and 60 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari requires continuous assistance with 61 
activities of daily living and ongoing treatment for his 62 
injuries, and 63 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hawari filed a lawsuit against the Osceola 64 
County School Board in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial 65 
Circuit, in and for Osceola County, alleging that the coaches in 66 
their employ had negligently supervised the wrestling match, 67 
causing his injuries, and 68 
 WHEREAS, after extensive discovery and pretrial 69 
preparation, the parties reached a settlement agreement in the 70 
amount of $3.6 million, of which $100,000 has been paid pursuant 71 
to the limits of liability in former s. 768.28, Florida Statute s 72 
(2010), and the remainder is conditioned upon the passage of a 73 
claim bill, NOW, THEREFORE, 74 
 75           
 ENROLLED  
CS/HB 6513, Engrossed 1 	2022 Legislature 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6513-03-er 
Page 4 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 76 
 77 
 Section 1.  The facts stated in the preamble to this act 78 
are found and declared to be true. 79 
 Section 2.  The Osceola County School Board is authorized 80 
and directed to appropriate from funds of the school board not 81 
otherwise encumbered and to draw a warrant in the sum of $3.5 82 
million payable to Kareem Hawari as compensation for injuries 83 
and damages sustained. 84 
 Section 3.  The amount paid by the Osceola County School 85 
Board pursuant to former s. 768.28, Florida Statutes (2010), and 86 
the amount awarded under this act are intended to provide the 87 
sole compensation for all present and future claims arising out 88 
of the factual situation described in this act which resulted in 89 
injuries and damages to Kareem Hawari. Of the amount awarded 90 
under this act, the total amount paid for attorney fees and 91 
lobbying fees may not exceed $875,000 and the total amount paid 92 
for costs or other similar expenses may not exceed $9,961.51. 93 
 Section 4.  This act shall take effect upon becoming a law. 94