|
05/26/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-141
|
|
|
|
05/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|