LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
H7003
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H7003
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H7003
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 1, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
February 24, 2022
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 26, 2022
Analysis
March 16, 2022
Analysis
February 16, 2022
Analysis
February 14, 2022
Analysis
January 20, 2022
Analysis
January 18, 2022
Analysis
January 13, 2022
Analysis
January 11, 2022