House | 02/09/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 98 | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Substituted SB 98 | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Filed |