Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H7023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022