|
06/01/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-142
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Amendment 658216 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (031891)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (658216)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment 031891 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 323
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (289912)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/12/22, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2021
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|