Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 13, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2022
Bill December 2, 2021