LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0494
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0494
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0494
Compare Versions
S0494 Enrolled March 11, 2022
S0494 Engrossed March 10, 2022
S0494 Engrossed February 10, 2022
S0494 Comm Sub January 31, 2022
S0494 Comm Sub December 2, 2021
S0494 Introduced October 13, 2021
Version 1 (Old)
S0494 Enrolled March 11, 2022
S0494 Engrossed March 10, 2022
S0494 Engrossed February 10, 2022
S0494 Comm Sub January 31, 2022
S0494 Comm Sub December 2, 2021
S0494 Introduced October 13, 2021
Version 2 (New)
Compare