|
04/20/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-71
|
|
|
|
04/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (816737)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 816737 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 959881 not allowed for consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 115557 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 114035 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 338403 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 553945 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 523505 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (335418, 840068) 570
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|