LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0768
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0768
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0768
Compare Versions
S0768 Enrolled March 11, 2022
S0768 Engrossed March 10, 2022
S0768 Engrossed March 3, 2022
S0768 Comm Sub March 2, 2022
S0768 Comm Sub January 27, 2022
S0768 Introduced November 2, 2021
Version 1 (Old)
S0768 Enrolled March 11, 2022
S0768 Engrossed March 10, 2022
S0768 Engrossed March 3, 2022
S0768 Comm Sub March 2, 2022
S0768 Comm Sub January 27, 2022
S0768 Introduced November 2, 2021
Version 2 (New)
Compare