Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0768 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022