|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-32
|
|
|
|
04/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 517
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (144414)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Banking and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|