Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0926 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 27, 2022
Bill January 14, 2022