LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0926
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0926
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0926
Compare Versions
S0926 Enrolled March 6, 2022
S0926 Engrossed February 10, 2022
S0926 Comm Sub January 27, 2022
S0926 Comm Sub January 14, 2022
S0926 Introduced November 16, 2021
Version 1 (Old)
S0926 Enrolled March 6, 2022
S0926 Engrossed February 10, 2022
S0926 Comm Sub January 27, 2022
S0926 Comm Sub January 14, 2022
S0926 Introduced November 16, 2021
Version 2 (New)
Compare