Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022