|
06/21/2023
|
Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted for SJR 94
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 79, NAYS 34
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|