|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-62
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 76
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/23/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|