Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0109 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 8, 2023
Analysis February 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023