Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2023
Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023