House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Substituted CS/SB 190
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|