|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-145
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 364
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|