Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023