House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 838 (Ch. 2023-118)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 4)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
PCS added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|