Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0709 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023