|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-150
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1308
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 99, NAYS 14
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 717579 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|