Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0761 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023