House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|