Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023