House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 238 (Ch. 2023-42), CS/SB 252 (Ch. 2023-43)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2023
|
PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
PCS added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|