Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023