House | 05/02/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1272 (Ch. 2023-93) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Filed |