Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 16, 2023