|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-68
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted for SB 7046
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|