Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1091 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023