|
05/25/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-129
|
|
|
|
05/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1266
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|